Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
House Calendar Number 617
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B,C
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 8178
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8175
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 8061
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
File Number 470
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 244
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|