LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2017 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00443
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00443
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2017 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00443
Action History
Senate
03/24/2017
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
Senate
03/23/2017
Drafted by Committee
Senate
03/10/2017
Vote to Draft
Senate
02/09/2017
Public Hearing 02/17
Senate
02/06/2017
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing