Senate
|
07/07/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Special Act 17-12
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
House Calendar Number 628
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
File Number 403
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 224
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|