Senate | 05/26/2017 | House Calendar Number 592 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7853 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | File Number 144 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 115 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/26/2017 | Vote to Draft |