Senate | 05/26/2017 | House Calendar Number 593 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | File Number 435 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 233 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |