Senate | 04/11/2017 | File Number 522 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | House Calendar Number 357 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | House Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Motion Failed SF | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |