Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00630 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Committee Bill No. 630
2-January Session, 2017 LCO No. 5406
3- *05406SB00630ET_*
1+General Assembly Proposed Bill No. 630
2+January Session, 2017 LCO No. 2460
3+ *02460*
44 Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY
55 Introduced by:
6-(ET)
6+SEN. WINFIELD, 10th Dist.
77
88 General Assembly
99
10-Committee Bill No. 630
10+Proposed Bill No. 630
1111
1212 January Session, 2017
1313
14-LCO No. 5406
14+LCO No. 2460
1515
16-*05406SB00630ET_*
16+*02460*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
22-(ET)
22+SEN. WINFIELD, 10th Dist.
2323
24-AN ACT CONCERNING THE RENEWABLE PORTFOLIO STANDARD.
24+AN ACT CONCERNING CLEAN AND RENEWABLE ENERGY OPPORTUNITIES AND USE OF RENEWABLE ENERGY SOURCES.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
28-Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 16-245a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2017):
29-
30-(a) An electric supplier and an electric distribution company providing standard service or supplier of last resort service, pursuant to section 16-244c, shall demonstrate:
31-
32-(1) On and after January 1, 2006, that not less than two per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
33-
34-(2) On and after January 1, 2007, not less than three and one-half per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
35-
36-(3) On and after January 1, 2008, not less than five per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
37-
38-(4) On and after January 1, 2009, not less than six per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
39-
40-(5) On and after January 1, 2010, not less than seven per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
41-
42-(6) On and after January 1, 2011, not less than eight per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
43-
44-(7) On and after January 1, 2012, not less than nine per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
45-
46-(8) On and after January 1, 2013, not less than ten per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
47-
48-(9) On and after January 1, 2014, not less than eleven per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
49-
50-(10) On and after January 1, 2015, not less than twelve and one-half per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
51-
52-(11) On and after January 1, 2016, not less than fourteen per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
53-
54-(12) On and after January 1, 2017, not less than fifteen and one-half per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
55-
56-(13) On and after January 1, 2018, not less than seventeen per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
57-
58-(14) On and after January 1, 2019, not less than nineteen and one-half per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
59-
60-(15) On and after January 1, 2020, not less than twenty per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources; [.]
61-
62-(16) On and after January 1, 2030, not less than thirty per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;
63-
64-(17) On and after January 1, 2040, not less than forty per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources.
65-
66-
67-
68-
69-This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
70-Section 1 October 1, 2017 16-245a(a)
71-
72-This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
73-
74-Section 1
75-
76-October 1, 2017
77-
78-16-245a(a)
28+That title 16 of the general statutes be amended to expand clean and renewable energy opportunities by increasing the renewable portfolio standard for electric suppliers and electric distribution companies and to better incentivize use of renewable energy sources.
7929
8030 Statement of Purpose:
8131
82-To increase the renewable portfolio standards in the future to better incentivize the use of renewable energy sources.
83-
84-[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]
85-
86-
87-
88-Co-Sponsors: SEN. WINFIELD, 10th Dist.; REP. URBAN, 43rd Dist.
89-
90-Co-Sponsors:
91-
92-SEN. WINFIELD, 10th Dist.; REP. URBAN, 43rd Dist.
93-
94-S.B. 630
32+To increase the renewable portfolio standard and better incentivize use of renewable energy sources.