Senate | 07/07/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/22/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/22/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/19/2017 | Public Act 17-149 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | House Calendar Number 595 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | File Number 406 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 215 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |