Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Calendar Number 655
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8758
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 8639
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8639
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
File Number 524
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 291
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|