Senate | 05/25/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2017 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | File Number 437 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 227 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |