Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
House Calendar Number 621
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule C 8181
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7542
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8108
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
File Number 744
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 425
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/09/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|