Senate | 03/28/2017 | File Number 270 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 161 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Motion Failed HF | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |