Senate | 03/27/2017 | File Number 243 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 143 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |