Senate | 06/08/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Public Act 17-33 | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | House Calendar Number 524 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | File Number 17 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 49 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/01/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/10 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |