Senate | 03/09/2017 | File Number 35 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 70 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |