Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | File Number 20 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 52 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/01/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |