Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00770 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 770
22 January Session, 2017 LCO No. 3301
3- *_____SB00770AGE___022117____*
3+ *03301_______AGE*
44 Referred to Committee on AGING
55 Introduced by:
66 (AGE)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 770
1111
1212 January Session, 2017
1313
1414 LCO No. 3301
1515
16-*_____SB00770AGE___022117____*
16+*03301_______AGE*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on AGING
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (AGE)
2323
2424 AN ACT INCREASING THE PERSONAL NEEDS ALLOWANCE FOR LONG-TERM CARE FACILITY RESIDENTS.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 17b-106 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2017):
2929
3030 (a) On January 1, 2006, and on each January first thereafter, the Commissioner of Social Services shall increase the unearned income disregard for recipients of the state supplement to the federal Supplemental Security Income Program by an amount equal to the federal cost-of-living adjustment, if any, provided to recipients of federal Supplemental Security Income Program benefits for the corresponding calendar year. On July 1, 1989, and annually thereafter, the commissioner shall increase the adult payment standards over those of the previous fiscal year for the state supplement to the federal Supplemental Security Income Program by the percentage increase, if any, in the most recent calendar year average in the consumer price index for urban consumers over the average for the previous calendar year, provided the annual increase, if any, shall not exceed five per cent, except that the adult payment standards for the fiscal years ending June 30, 1993, June 30, 1994, June 30, 1995, June 30, 1996, June 30, 1997, June 30, 1998, June 30, 1999, June 30, 2000, June 30, 2001, June 30, 2002, June 30, 2003, June 30, 2004, June 30, 2005, June 30, 2006, June 30, 2007, June 30, 2008, June 30, 2009, June 30, 2010, June 30, 2011, June 30, 2012, June 30, 2013, June 30, 2016, and June 30, 2017, shall not be increased. Effective October 1, 1991, the coverage of excess utility costs for recipients of the state supplement to the federal Supplemental Security Income Program is eliminated. Notwithstanding the provisions of this section, the commissioner may increase the personal needs allowance component of the adult payment standard as necessary to meet federal maintenance of effort requirements.
3131
3232 (b) Effective July 1, [2011] 2017, the commissioner shall provide a state supplement payment for recipients of Medicaid and the federal Supplemental Security Income Program who reside in long-term care facilities sufficient to increase their personal needs allowance to [sixty] seventy-two dollars and seventy-five cents per month. Such state supplement payment shall be made to the long-term care facility to be deposited into the personal fund account of each such recipient. For the purposes of this subsection, "long-term care facility" means a licensed chronic and convalescent nursing home, a chronic disease hospital, a rest home with nursing supervision, an intermediate care facility for individuals with intellectual disabilities or a state humane institution.
3333
3434 Sec. 2. Section 17b-272 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2017):
3535
3636 Effective July 1, [2011] 2017, the Commissioner of Social Services shall permit patients residing in nursing homes, chronic disease hospitals and state humane institutions who are medical assistance recipients under sections 17b-260 to 17b-262, inclusive, 17b-264 to 17b-285, inclusive, and 17b-357 to 17b-361, inclusive, to have a monthly personal fund allowance of [sixty dollars] seventy-two dollars and seventy-five cents.
3737
3838
3939
4040
4141 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4242 Section 1 July 1, 2017 17b-106
4343 Sec. 2 July 1, 2017 17b-272
4444
4545 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4646
4747 Section 1
4848
4949 July 1, 2017
5050
5151 17b-106
5252
5353 Sec. 2
5454
5555 July 1, 2017
5656
5757 17b-272
5858
59+Statement of Purpose:
5960
61+To provide sufficient funds for the personal needs of long-term care facility residents.
6062
61-AGE Joint Favorable
62-
63-AGE
64-
65-Joint Favorable
63+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]