Senate | 05/17/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2017 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | File Number 38 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 73 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |