Senate | 06/02/2017 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Senate Reconsidered | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | File Number 339 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 182 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/10/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |