Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
Public Act 17-202
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
House Calendar Number 649
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A 8612
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8612
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
File Number 482
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 272
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|