Senate | 05/24/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Public Act 17-4 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | House Calendar Number 435 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | File Number 202 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 138 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/10/2017 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |