Senate | 03/07/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/10/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |