Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
Public Act 17-203
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8986
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
File Number 244
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 148
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|