Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Public Act 17-59
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House Calendar Number 596
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6120
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
File Number 155
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 117
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|