Senate | 07/07/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/23/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/23/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/19/2017 | Special Act 17-14 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | House Calendar Number 527 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | File Number 40 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 75 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |