Senate | 03/21/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |