Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Special Act 17-22
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8710
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House Calendar Number 530
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7233
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
File Number 408
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 205
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|