Senate
|
07/07/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Public Act 17-153
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House Calendar Number 531
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6833
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
File Number 204
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 128
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|