Senate | 06/06/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Public Act 17-21 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | House Calendar Number 437 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | File Number 245 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 144 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |