Senate | 04/20/2017 | House Calendar Number 438 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 78 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | File Number 63 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |