Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Public Act 17-78
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
House Calendar Number 634
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8107
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
File Number 273
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 156
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|