Senate | 03/27/2017 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Change of Reference to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Education | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |