1 | 1 | | General Assembly Raised Bill No. 845 |
---|
2 | 2 | | January Session, 2017 LCO No. 3988 |
---|
3 | 3 | | *03988_______PS_* |
---|
4 | 4 | | Referred to Committee on PUBLIC SAFETY AND SECURITY |
---|
5 | 5 | | Introduced by: |
---|
6 | 6 | | (PS) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | General Assembly |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | Raised Bill No. 845 |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | January Session, 2017 |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | LCO No. 3988 |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | *03988_______PS_* |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | Referred to Committee on PUBLIC SAFETY AND SECURITY |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | Introduced by: |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | (PS) |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | AN ACT CONCERNING SECURITY AT INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION. |
---|
25 | 25 | | |
---|
26 | 26 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: |
---|
27 | 27 | | |
---|
28 | 28 | | Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) Not later than October 1, 2017, the Police Officer Standards and Training Council established under section 7-294b of the general statutes, in consultation with the Connecticut Conference of Independent Colleges, shall develop a model policy that (1) provides training standards for armed security personnel who are not certified under the provisions of sections 7-294a to 7-294e, inclusive, of the general statutes, and are employed by an independent institution of higher education, as defined in section 10a-173 of the general statutes, and (2) identifies instructors who are qualified to provide training to such armed security personnel. |
---|
29 | 29 | | |
---|
30 | 30 | | (b) On and after July 1, 2018, any independent institution of higher education that employs armed security personnel who are not certified under the provisions of sections 7-294a to 7-294e, inclusive, of the general statutes shall require such armed security personnel to complete training that meets or exceeds the requirements of the model policy developed pursuant to subsection (a) of this section. |
---|
31 | 31 | | |
---|
32 | 32 | | (c) Not later than July 1, 2018, and every two years thereafter, such independent institution of higher education shall submit a report to the Police Officer Standards and Training Council concerning its compliance with and enforcement of such model policy. |
---|
33 | 33 | | |
---|
34 | 34 | | Sec. 2. Subsection (a) of section 10a-156a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2017): |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | (a) Not later than October 1, 2013, each constituent unit of the state system of higher education and each independent institution of higher education, as defined in subsection (a) of section 10a-173, shall submit an up-to-date security protocol plan to the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection. Such plan shall identify procedures specifically designed to heighten awareness by all faculty and staff regarding potentially at-risk students and other individuals on campus through effective educational strategies. Such procedures shall be designed to educate faculty and staff on how to recognize and respond to students and such other individuals who may be at risk of harm to themselves or others. Not later than July 1, 2015, and biennially thereafter, each constituent unit and independent institution of higher education shall review the security protocol plan with each of its chiefs of police or heads of campus security to determine whether such plan adequately addresses campus security concerns or requires revisions. [In the event that] On and after July 1, 2017, such review shall consider any safety and security audit of such constituent unit or independent institution of higher education, including any safety and security audit conducted pursuant to section 96 of public act 13-3. If revisions are required, the constituent unit or independent institution of higher education making revisions shall submit a revised security protocol plan to the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection not later than August first of the year in which revisions are deemed necessary. |
---|
37 | 37 | | |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: |
---|
42 | 42 | | Section 1 from passage New section |
---|
43 | 43 | | Sec. 2 July 1, 2017 10a-156a(a) |
---|
44 | 44 | | |
---|
45 | 45 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: |
---|
46 | 46 | | |
---|
47 | 47 | | Section 1 |
---|
48 | 48 | | |
---|
49 | 49 | | from passage |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | New section |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | Sec. 2 |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | July 1, 2017 |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | 10a-156a(a) |
---|
58 | 58 | | |
---|
59 | 59 | | Statement of Purpose: |
---|
60 | 60 | | |
---|
61 | 61 | | To require the Police Officer Standards and Training Council and the Connecticut Conference of Independent Colleges to develop a model training policy for armed security personnel at institutions of higher education and private occupational schools, and to require constituent units and institutions of higher education to consider any safety and security audits when reviewing security protocol plans. |
---|
62 | 62 | | |
---|
63 | 63 | | [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.] |
---|