Senate | 05/31/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Public Act 17-11 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | House Calendar Number 441 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | File Number 207 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 139 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |