Senate | 05/25/2017 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | File Number 106 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 94 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |