Senate | 04/13/2017 | File Number 625 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 318 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |