Senate | 05/09/2017 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | File Number 341 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 179 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |