Senate | 03/23/2017 | File Number 209 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 134 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |