Senate | 04/05/2017 | File Number 439 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 234 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |