Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | File Number 246 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 149 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |