Senate
|
06/30/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
Public Act 17-91
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House Calendar Number 566
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7614
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
File Number 647
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 336
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|