Senate | 05/19/2017 | House Calendar Number 534 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7343 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | File Number 161 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 108 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |