Senate | 04/05/2017 | File Number 441 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | House Calendar Number 306 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Motion Failed SF | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | House Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |