Senate | 06/27/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/09/2017 | Public Act 17-64 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | House Calendar Number 475 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6277 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | File Number 344 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 181 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |