Senate | 04/04/2017 | File Number 413 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 218 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |