Senate | 05/31/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Public Act 17-13 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | House Calendar Number 476 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | File Number 305 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 166 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |