Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2017
|
Public Act 17-65
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
House Calendar Number 614
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7588
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
File Number 109
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 97
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|