Senate | 04/13/2017 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | File Number 110 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 98 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |