Senate | 03/30/2017 | File Number 345 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | House Calendar Number 252 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | House Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Motion Failed SF | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |