Senate
|
07/07/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Special Act 17-10
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House Calendar Number 541
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6682
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
File Number 308
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 170
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|